A Royal Flush, Inc. v. Arias
Court Docket Sheet

District of Connecticut

3:2018-cv-01206 (ctd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/20/2018
Notice of Removal
2
07/20/2018
Notice (Other)
07/23/2018
Add and Terminate Judges (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/23/2018
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
4
07/23/2018
Electronic Filing Order
5
07/23/2018
Protective Order
07/23/2018
Notice 83.1 (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/23/2018
Electronic Service Documents
8
07/25/2018
Admission Pro Hac Vice
9
07/25/2018
Affidavit
07/26/2018
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
07/30/2018
Preliminary Injunction
12
07/30/2018
Memorandum in Support of Motion
13
07/30/2018
Affidavit
14
07/30/2018
Affidavit
15
07/30/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
16
07/30/2018
Certificate of Service
07/31/2018
Calendar Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
08/01/2018
Notice of Appearance
08/01/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2018
Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
08/02/2018
Notice of Appearance
23
08/03/2018
Order
08/03/2018
Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
08/03/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
25
08/03/2018
Response
08/05/2018
Order on Motion for Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Calendar Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
08/13/2018
Continue
08/13/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Calendar Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
08/17/2018
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
34
08/17/2018
Affidavit
35
08/27/2018
Third Party Complaint
36
08/27/2018
Counterclaim
37
08/27/2018
Third Party Complaint
38
08/29/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
09/05/2018
Calendar Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
Calendar Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Calendar Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
09/13/2018
Extension of Time
09/14/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
09/17/2018
Dismiss
46
09/19/2018
Motion Hearing
47
09/19/2018
Exhibit List
48
09/21/2018
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
09/25/2018
Order Revoking Visiting Attorney Status (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
09/30/2018
Admission Pro Hac Vice
10/02/2018
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
10/09/2018
Admission Pro Hac Vice
52
10/09/2018
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
10/10/2018
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
10/15/2018
Notice of Appearance
10/16/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
10/18/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
10/22/2018
Calendar Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
Calendar Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Settlement Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Calendar Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
10/30/2018
Order
64
11/21/2018
Continue
11/26/2018
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Calendar Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Settlement Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Calendar Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/05/2018
Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
12/07/2018
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.