A SQUARED JOINT VENTURE v. USA
Court Docket Sheet

Court of Federal Claims

1:2017-cv-00835 (cofc)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
07/28/2017
REPORTED OPINION denying 4 Motion for TRO; denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Status Report with proposed schedule for resolving the case on the merits due by 8/14/2017. Signed by Senior Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (tc) Copy to parties.
35
10/17/2017
ORDER denying 29 Motion for Discovery; denying 29 Motion to Supplement the Administrative RecordThe parties shall have until October 25, 2017 to submit a proposed schedule for resolving this case on the merits. Signed by Senior Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (js) Copy to parties.
36
10/17/2017
ORDER denying 29 Motion for Discovery; denying 29 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. The parties shall have until October 25, 2017 to submit a proposed schedule for resolving this case on the merits. Signed by Senior Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jt) Copy to parties. Docketed for Administrative Purposes
64
05/01/2018
UNREPORTED ORDER granting 59 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) ; This matter is REMANDED to the National Aeronautics and Space Agency, Marshall Space Flight Center. The agency shall issue a new decision by 5/15/2018. The government shall submit the agency's report along with a status report with proposed next steps by 5/18/2018.Signed by Senior Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (js) Service on parties made.
68
05/29/2018
Status Report
69
05/30/2018
Redacted Document
70
05/31/2018
Order
71
06/06/2018
Decision on Remand by Agency
72
06/07/2018
Notice (Other) PLEASE DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL
73
06/28/2018
Notice (Other) PLEASE DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL
74
06/29/2018
Status Report Order
75
07/12/2018
Status Report
76
07/16/2018
Scheduling Order
77
07/30/2018
Response
78
08/01/2018
Extension of Time to File Reply
79
08/02/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply
80
08/13/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
81
08/16/2018
Strike
82
08/20/2018
Order on Motion to Strike
83
08/27/2018
Sur-Reply
84
08/28/2018
Status Conference
85
08/29/2018
Order on Motion for Status Conference
87
09/11/2018
Status Report (JOINT)
88
09/11/2018
Scheduling Order
89
09/21/2018
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
90
09/24/2018
Notice of Filing of Certified Transcript
91
09/24/2018
Transcript
92
09/26/2018
Administrative Record (Supplement)
93
09/26/2018
Notice (Other) PLEASE DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL
94
10/08/2018
Supplemental Brief
95
10/10/2018
Seal Document
96
10/11/2018
Order on Motion to Seal Document
97
10/18/2018
Cross Motion and Response
98
10/25/2018
Response to Cross Motion
99
11/01/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
100
11/06/2018
Sur-Reply
101
11/19/2018
Order on Motion for Judgment on the Admin. Record
11/19/2018
Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
102
11/26/2018
Amend Schedule
103
11/27/2018
Order on Motion to Amend Schedule
104
11/29/2018
Order
105
11/30/2018
Redacted Document
106
12/07/2018
Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)
107
12/07/2018
Status Report
108
12/10/2018
Scheduling Order
109
12/11/2018
Stay
110
12/11/2018
Order on Motion to Stay
111
12/13/2018
Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on Motion
112
12/14/2018
Response to Motion
12/20/2018
Oral Argument (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
12/21/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)
114
12/31/2018
Stay
115
01/02/2019
Order on Motion to Stay
116
02/01/2019
Status Report (JOINT)
117
02/01/2019
Order
118
02/19/2019
Extension of Time

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.