A Slice of New York Inc
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-10587 (flmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/12/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
12/12/2018
Statement of Social Security Numbers (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
12/12/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments
4
12/12/2018
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
12/12/2018
Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/13/2018
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
6
12/13/2018
Notice Of Deficient Filing
7
12/14/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments
8
12/14/2018
Order Of Impending Dismissal
10
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
11
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
12
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
13
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
14
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
15
12/21/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay (not for amended motions)
16
01/02/2019
Notice and Order Scheduling Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Relief from the Stay
17
01/02/2019
Notice Of Hearing / Status Conference (Including Reaff)
18
01/02/2019
Motion to Extend Time
19
01/03/2019
Notice Of Hearing / Status Conference (Including Reaff)
20
01/03/2019
Proof of Service
21
01/03/2019
Order Dismissing Case (BK cases only)
22
01/03/2019
Motion to Strike
23
01/03/2019
Certificate Of Necessity
24
01/03/2019
Notice Of Failure To Comply With Local Rule 1001-2
25
01/03/2019
Order Striking
26
01/03/2019
Order Dismissing Case (BK cases only)
27
01/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice
28
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
29
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
30
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order/Notice Dismissing Case
02/05/2019
Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.