A Slice of New York Inc
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida (Bankruptcy)

8:2019-bk-00955 (flmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/04/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
2
02/04/2019
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
3
02/04/2019
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
02/04/2019
Receipt of Full Filing Fee (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Prior Bankruptcy Case(s) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
02/05/2019
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
5
02/05/2019
Notice Of Deficient Filing
7
02/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
8
02/07/2019
Order Of Impending Dismissal
9
02/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
10
02/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest
11
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
12
02/12/2019
Motion for Relief from Stay (not for amended motions)
13
02/12/2019
Notice Of Hearing / Status Conference (Including Reaff)
14
02/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice
15
02/27/2019
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
17
02/28/2019
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules, Statements, Ch. 13 Plan
18
02/28/2019
Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney
19
02/28/2019
Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Plan and Disclosure Statement (after status conference)
20
03/01/2019
Application to Employ/Retain
03/01/2019
(NO PAPER) - Rescheduled Meeting for Non-Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
03/01/2019
Certificate Of Service
22
03/01/2019
Order on Application to Employ/Retain (BK)
23
03/01/2019
Response
24
03/01/2019
Extend Deadline to File Schedules, Statements, Plans
25
03/05/2019
Z - Generic Application (use only when there is no specific motion event)
26
03/05/2019
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary
27
03/05/2019
Equity Security Holders
28
03/05/2019
SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)
29
03/05/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs
30
03/05/2019
Statement of Corporate Ownership
31
03/05/2019
Statement
32
03/05/2019
Notice and Order Scheduling Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Relief from the Stay
03/07/2019
ADI Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
ADI Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
03/07/2019
Certificate Of Service
35
03/07/2019
Certificate Of Service
36
03/08/2019
Generic Application
37
03/08/2019
Motion to Assume or Reject Lease/Executory Contract
38
03/08/2019
Certificate Of Service
03/11/2019
ADI Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
03/13/2019
Certificate Of Service
03/15/2019
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
03/20/2019
Financial Reports - Chapter 11
03/20/2019
ADI Reminder to Prepare and Serve Notice of Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
03/21/2019
Certificate Of Service
44
03/21/2019
Financial Reports - Chapter 11
03/26/2019
(NO PAPER) - Chapter 11 - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
(NO PAPER) - Notice Of Non-Appointment of Creditors' Committee (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
04/03/2019
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
46
04/03/2019
Order (Generic)
04/09/2019
ADI Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
04/10/2019
Certificate Of Service

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.