A T & T CORP. v. PEGATRON TECHNOLOGY SERVICE, INC.
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Indiana

4:2018-cv-00176 (insd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/25/2018
Notice of Removal
2
09/25/2018
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
3
09/25/2018
Declaration
4
09/25/2018
Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction
5
09/25/2018
Notice to File Corporate Disclosure Statement
6
09/25/2018
Notice of Appearance
7
09/25/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
8
09/26/2018
SCHEDULING Order
9
10/10/2018
Extension of Time (Other)
10
10/11/2018
Notice of Appearance
11
10/11/2018
Notice of Appearance
12
10/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
13
10/19/2018
Appear pro hac vice
14
10/22/2018
Submission
10/23/2018
Receipt (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/29/2018
Extension of Time (Other)
17
10/30/2018
Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
18
11/02/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
19
11/20/2018
Extension of Time (Other)
20
11/21/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.