A Touch Of Jazz, Inc
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Delaware (Bankruptcy)

1:2010-bk-12250 (deb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
233
11/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
234
12/14/2018
Certificate of No Objection(Aty)
235
12/14/2018
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
236
12/27/2018
Order
12/27/2018
Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
238
12/27/2018
Distribution
239
12/27/2018
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
01/03/2019
Fee Awarded (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic (Text entry; no document attached.)
241
03/29/2019
Certification of Completion with UST Certification

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.