A V Car & Home, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Columbia (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-00434 (dcb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/20/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
06/20/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/20/2018
Declaration
06/20/2018
First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
06/20/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
5
06/21/2018
Order Directing Debtor's Attorney to File Rule 2016(B) Statement
6
06/21/2018
Order to File Required Documents
7
06/21/2018
First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC
8
06/21/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)
9
06/21/2018
Employ
06/22/2018
Electronic Deficiency - Ntc of Opp to Object Not Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
06/22/2018
Opportunity to Object (21 Days)
11
06/22/2018
Certificate of Service
13
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors
14
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents
15
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
16
07/02/2018
Appearance (Attorney)
17
07/05/2018
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
18
07/05/2018
Appearance (Attorney)
19
07/06/2018
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
20
07/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
21
07/09/2018
Dismiss Case
07/10/2018
Electronic Deficiency - Generic (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Electronic Deficiency - Generic (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
07/10/2018
Opportunity to Object (21 Days)
23
07/13/2018
Schedules A/B-J
24
07/16/2018
Order To File Amended Schedules To Include Signed Declaration
25
07/16/2018
Order To File Statement Of No Alterations, Amended Matrix Or Show Cause
26
07/16/2018
Declaration
27
07/16/2018
Employ
28
07/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
29
07/23/2018
Amended Matrix or Schedules: Change EXISITING Name and/or Address
07/25/2018
Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Electronic Deficiency - Generic (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
07/25/2018
Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)
07/27/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
33
07/30/2018
Certificate of Service Re: Amendment To Matrix (LBR 1009-2(e))
34
07/30/2018
Certificate of Service
35
07/30/2018
Opposition
36
08/01/2018
Hearing Continued
37
08/01/2018
Certificate of Service
38
08/27/2018
Operating Report
39
08/27/2018
Operating Report
40
08/27/2018
Approve
41
08/27/2018
Opportunity to Object (14 Days)
42
08/28/2018
Relief from Stay
43
08/28/2018
Opportunity to Object (17 Days)
44
08/28/2018
Hearing
08/28/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Electronic Deficiency - Generic (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Hearing - Scheduled (BK) (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
08/28/2018
Amended Notice
48
09/11/2018
Opposition
49
09/14/2018
Opposition
50
09/21/2018
Hearing - Continued (BK)
51
09/24/2018
Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period
52
09/24/2018
Opportunity to Object (17 Days) Per LBR 9013-1(b)(4)
09/25/2018
Electronic Deficiency - Generic (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
10/01/2018
Proposed Order (Corrections, Deficiencies, OTBS, etc.)
54
10/04/2018
Hearing - Scheduled (BK)
55
10/09/2018
Hearing - Scheduled (BK)
56
10/09/2018
Opposition
57
10/12/2018
Hearing - Held (BK)
58
10/22/2018
Operating Report
59
10/31/2018
Proposed Consent Order
60
10/31/2018
Proposed Consent Order
61
10/31/2018
Proposed Consent Order
62
11/01/2018
Order for Relief
63
11/01/2018
Approving
64
11/01/2018
Extend Exclusivity Period
65
11/07/2018
Dismiss Case
66
11/07/2018
Opportunity to Object (21 Days)
67
11/16/2018
Operating Report
68
11/16/2018
Chapter 11 Plan
69
11/16/2018
Disclosure Statement
70
11/26/2018
Order And Notice For Hearing On Disclosure Statement
71
11/28/2018
Opposition
72
12/05/2018
Certificate of Service
73
12/05/2018
Opportunity to Object (21 Days)
74
12/05/2018
Certificate of Service
75
12/06/2018
Hearing - Scheduled (BK)
76
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (BK)
77
12/18/2018
Response

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.