A V Hankins and Jennifer Rayford
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California (Bankruptcy)

2:2015-bk-25920 (cacb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Compensation (motion)
34
06/21/2018
Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3))
35
06/22/2018
Compensation (BNC-PDF)
36
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
37
07/17/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (motion)
10/22/2018
Hearing Held (Motion) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.