A Voce Columbus, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Delaware (Bankruptcy)

1:2016-bk-11479 (deb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/01/2018
Certificate of No Objection(Aty)
1
06/14/2016
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of A Voce Columbus, LLC
doc
06/04/2018
Certificate of No Objection(Aty)
128
06/13/2018
Compensation (Application)
135
07/26/2018
Generic BNC Notice (PDF)
136
07/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
138
08/10/2018
RETIRED - Complaint
139
08/10/2018
RETIRED - Complaint
142
08/22/2018
Order
11/07/2018
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
151
01/07/2019
Status Report
152
01/07/2019
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
01/07/2019
Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
154
01/08/2019
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
155
02/21/2019
Status Report
156
03/13/2019
Employ/Retain - Application/Motion
157
04/09/2019
Status Report
158
04/10/2019
Certificate of No Objection(Aty)
159
04/11/2019
Employ (Application)
160
04/12/2019
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.