A W T Be Good L L C v. Chesapeake Louisiana L P et al
Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Louisiana

5:2016-cv-01412 (lawd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
44
07/31/2018
Settlement Conference
45
10/04/2018
Partial Summary Judgment
46
10/04/2018
Notice of Motion Setting
47
10/04/2018
Summary Judgment
48
10/04/2018
Notice of Deficiency
49
10/04/2018
Summary Judgment
50
10/04/2018
Corrective Document
51
10/05/2018
Notice of Motion Setting
52
10/05/2018
Notice of Motion Setting
53
10/17/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
54
10/17/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
10/18/2018
Motions Transferred (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
10/18/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
56
10/18/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
57
11/02/2018
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
58
11/02/2018
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
59
11/02/2018
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
60
11/02/2018
Sealed Document (Sealed Pleading)
61
11/02/2018
Response to Motion
11/05/2018
Motions Transferred (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
11/06/2018
Order on Sealed Motion
63
11/06/2018
Sealed Document (Sealed Pleading)
64
11/09/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
65
11/09/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
66
11/09/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
67
11/09/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
68
11/26/2018
Continue
69
11/27/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
70
01/11/2019
MEMORANDUM RULING re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chesapeake Operating L L C, Chesapeake Energy Marketing L L C, Chesapeake Louisiana L P, 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by P X P Louisiana L L C, 45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by A W T Be Good L L C. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 1/11/2019. (crt,McDonnell, D)
71
01/11/2019
Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
01/14/2019
Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
01/16/2019
Response (NOT Motions)
01/16/2019
Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
01/31/2019
Appear Pro Hac Vice
76
02/01/2019
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
77
02/07/2019
Enroll as Counsel
78
02/08/2019
Reconsideration
79
02/11/2019
Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel
80
02/11/2019
Notice of Motion Setting
81
02/13/2019
Leave to File Document
02/13/2019
Motions Transferred (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
Scheduling Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
02/14/2019
Scheduling Order - Hicks
84
02/19/2019
Notice of Motion Setting
85
02/25/2019
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
86
03/04/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
87
03/05/2019
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
88
03/07/2019
Reply to Response to Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.