A White and Yellow Cab, Inc. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of California

4:2015-cv-05163 (cand)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
38
06/06/2016
ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONTINUING HEARINGS as to 18 MOTION to Dismiss; MOTION to Strike Portions of Complaint; 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/16/16.
41
07/11/2016
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS AND GRANTING 39 ADMINISTATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL JUDICIAL NOTICE. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/11/16. Modified on 7/11/2016
43
07/13/2016
ORDER GRANTING 42 Administrative Motion to File Supplemental Request ofr Judicial Notice re 18 Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint. Responses to Supplemental Request for due by 7/19/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 13, 2016. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/14/2016
64
03/31/2017
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 18 Motion to Dismiss and DENYING AS MOOT Motion to Strike. Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2017. If Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint, it may do so by no later thant 4/28/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 31, 2017. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/3/2017
87
10/17/2017
ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE, IN PART, 70 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 17, 2017. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF)
119
05/25/2018
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.