A and F Bahamas, LLC v. World Venture Group et al
Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California

2:2017-cv-08523 (cacd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
69
06/12/2018
Telephone Conference
71
06/25/2018
Declaration
73
06/26/2018
Errata
75
08/02/2018
Order
76
08/07/2018
Compel
77
08/08/2018
Errata
78
08/08/2018
Compel
79
08/10/2018
Affidavit
81
08/21/2018
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
82
08/23/2018
Enforce Judgment
83
08/23/2018
Enforce Judgment
84
08/29/2018
Judgment Debtor Exam
85
09/19/2018
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
86
09/24/2018
Compel
87
09/24/2018
Show Cause
89
09/26/2018
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
90
09/27/2018
Writ of Execution - Issued
91
10/02/2018
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
92
10/19/2018
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
93
10/19/2018
Compel
95
11/01/2018
Memorandum in Support of Motion
96
11/02/2018
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
107
11/27/2018
Reply (Motion related)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.