A and M Trust Co. v. Rolls Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC
Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California

8:2018-cv-01595 (cacd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
09/17/2018
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
11
10/05/2018
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
12
11/13/2018
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
13
11/30/2018
Scheduling Conference - optional html form
14
12/05/2018
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.