A and T Homebuilders, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Tennessee (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-06610 (tnmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/01/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
10/01/2018
Auto-Docket of Payment (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
4
10/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/12/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice
12/10/2018
Final Decree Chapter 7 (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.