A et al v. NIELSEN et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of New Jersey

2:2018-cv-09214 (njd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
1
05/15/2018
Complaint
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
05/15/2018
Summons Issued
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2018
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
05/15/2018
Exhibit (to Document)
4
05/15/2018
Certify Class
5
05/15/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
6
05/21/2018
Exhibit (to Document)
7
05/21/2018
Exhibit (to Document)
8
05/21/2018
Exhibit (to Document)
9
05/21/2018
Exhibit (to Document)
10
05/25/2018
Notice of Appearance
11
05/25/2018
Notice of Appearance
12
05/25/2018
Notice of Appearance
13
05/25/2018
Notice of Appearance
14
05/25/2018
Certificate of Service
15
05/30/2018
Notice of Appearance
16
05/30/2018
Notice of Appearance
05/31/2018
Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
06/01/2018
Notice of Appearance
18
06/05/2018
~Util - Set Hearings
19
06/05/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
20
06/06/2018
Letter
06/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
06/08/2018
Letter
23
06/08/2018
Telephone Conference
06/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
06/08/2018
Letter
26
06/12/2018
Letter
27
06/13/2018
Letter
28
06/13/2018
Letter
06/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
QC - Generic Message (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
06/14/2018
Letter
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
06/18/2018
Letter
33
06/18/2018
Response (NOT Motion)
06/19/2018
Discovery Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
06/18/2018
Seal Document
35
06/19/2018
Transcript
36
06/19/2018
Transcript
06/20/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
QC - Document Filed in Incorrect Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
06/20/2018
Appear Pro Hac Vice
38
06/20/2018
Response (NOT Motion)
06/22/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
06/22/2018
Response (NOT Motion)
40
06/25/2018
Letter
41
06/27/2018
Transcript
06/27/2018
Telephone Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
06/28/2018
Opinion
44
06/29/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
45
06/29/2018
Response (NOT Motion)
07/02/2018
Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
07/02/2018
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
07/02/2018
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
07/03/2018
Letter
48
07/03/2018
Letter
49
07/06/2018
Letter
50
07/06/2018
Response (NOT Motion)
51
07/09/2018
Exhibit (to Document)
07/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
07/12/2018
Dismiss
55
07/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
57
07/13/2018
Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court
07/16/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
07/16/2018
Notice of Appearance
59
07/16/2018
Transcript
60
07/16/2018
Telephone Conference
61
07/17/2018
Brief
62
07/19/2018
Order on Motion to Seal Document
63
07/19/2018
Letter
07/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
07/26/2018
Brief in Opposition to Motion
67
07/30/2018
Letter
68
08/01/2018
Transcript
69
08/02/2018
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.