A. et al v. San Diego, City of et al
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of California

3:2014-cv-01942 (casd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
109
02/14/2018
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Adopting 90 Report and Recommendation and Dismissing with Prejudice Plaintiffs Tayna A., Angela C., Bereniz F., Katelynn D., Diana D., Tiana E., Maritza G., Brianna H., Emilia J., Clarissa J., and Mariya W. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/13/2018.
114
03/16/2018
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/16/2018.
131
05/31/2018
Order on Motion for Contempt
132
05/31/2018
Judgment on the Pleadings
133
06/07/2018
Order
134
06/08/2018
Order on Motion for Order
135
06/14/2018
Miscellaneous (Other 1)
136
06/15/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
137
06/15/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)
138
06/19/2018
Judgment on the Pleadings
139
06/19/2018
Motion to File Documents Under Seal
140
06/19/2018
Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
141
06/19/2018
Notice of Appearance
142
06/19/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
143
06/20/2018
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
144
06/21/2018
Summary Judgment
145
07/02/2018
Notice of Appearance
146
07/09/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
147
07/10/2018
Motion to File Documents Under Seal
148
07/10/2018
Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
07/17/2018
Notice of Change of Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
150
07/17/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
151
07/17/2018
Joint Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
152
08/29/2018
Clarify
153
08/30/2018
Order on Motion to Clarify
154
10/05/2018
Order
155
11/15/2018
Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal
156
12/13/2018
Order to Show Cause
157
12/20/2018
Dismiss
158
12/21/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.