A & t Systems, inc v. USA
Court Docket Sheet

Court of Federal Claims

1:2012-cv-00179 (cofc)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
8
04/23/2012
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 15, 2012 to File Response to the Complaint. Response due by 6/15/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
18
06/25/2013
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Telephonic Oral Argument set for 9/23/2013 at 2:00 PM (EST) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
24
09/23/2013
ORDER denying 14 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying defendants cross-motion for summary judgment. Joint Status Report due 10/11/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.