A v. Arrowhead Union High School District et al
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Wisconsin

2:2018-cv-00673 (wied)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
15
05/21/2018
Dismiss
16
05/21/2018
Brief in Support of Motion
17
05/22/2018
Scheduling Conference
18
05/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines
19
06/11/2018
Brief in Opposition to Motion
20
06/18/2018
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
21
07/16/2018
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/16/2018: GRANTING in part 15 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING with prejudice Plaintiff's claims under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 for violation of her rights under the Fourteenth Amendment; and REMANDING CASE, including Plaintiff's remaining claim under Wisconsin law for a writ of certiorari, to the Waukesha County Circuit Court for further proceedings. See Order. (cc: all counsel)
07/16/2018
Transfer File-Out of District (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Notice of Electronic Filing Error (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
07/16/2018
Bill of Costs
23
07/17/2018
Briefing Letter Transmitted

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.