ADRIAN LUCERO
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona (Bankruptcy)

0:2018-bk-05906 (azb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)
doc
05/23/2018
Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
Request for Notice
05/25/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/28/2018
BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)
doc
05/29/2018
Request for Notice
doc
05/30/2018
Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
doc
05/31/2018
zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)
9
07/03/2018
Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2
10
07/12/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
07/19/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
09/25/2018
BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge
13
09/27/2018
zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)
10/03/2018
Close Bankruptcy Case (BMW) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
11 CREDITOR - Request for Notice (batch) (no document) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.