AGUILAR v. VITAMIN SHOPPE, INC. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of New Jersey

2:2017-cv-06454 (njd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 244 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
Civil Cover Sheet
1 Attachment
08/28/2017
Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
08/28/2017
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRENDA M. GALGANO, RICHARD L. MARKEE, VITAMIN SHOPPE, INC., COLIN F. WATTS Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Donato Marucci*
3
08/30/2017
AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by IVAN I. AGUILAR.
4
10/27/2017
MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Richard Schubert.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
4
Exhibit
5
Exhibit
6
Exhibit
7
Declaration
8
Text of Proposed Order
8 Attachments
5
10/27/2017
MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by Corpus Christi Firefighters Retirement System.
1
Brief
2
Declaration of James E. Cecchi
3
Exhibit A
4
Exhibit B
5
Exhibit C
6
Exhibit D
7
Exhibit E
8
Text of Proposed Order
8 Attachments
10/30/2017
Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, 5 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. Motion set for 11/20/2017 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/06/2017
BRIEF in Opposition filed by Richard Schubert re 4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, 5 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
7
11/06/2017
BRIEF in Opposition filed by Corpus Christi Firefighters Retirement System re 4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff
1
Declaration of James E. Cecchi
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B
4
Exhibit C
5
Exhibit D
6
Exhibit E
7
Exhibit F
8
Exhibit G
9
Exhibit H
9 Attachments
8
11/13/2017
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Corpus Christi Firefighters Retirement System re 4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, 5 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel
9
11/13/2017
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Richard Schubert re 4 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff
1
Declaration
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B
3 Attachments
10
11/15/2017
Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez to Judge Hammer enclosing pro hac vice documents.
1
Certification of Lisa J. Rodriguez
2
Certification of Robert V. Prongay
3
Text of Proposed Order
3 Attachments
11
11/16/2017
ORDER granting re 10 Letter Appl. for pro hac vice admission as to ROBERT V. PRONGAY, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/16/17.
12/12/2017
Pro Hac Vice fee as to ROBERT V. PRONGAY, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW035180 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
01/18/2018
Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez to Judge Hammer enclosing pro hac vice documents.
1
Certification of Lisa J. Rodriguez
2
Certification of Thomas Laughlin, IV
3
Text of Proposed Order
3 Attachments
13
01/19/2018
ORDER granting re 12 Letter Appl. for pro hac vice admission as to THOMAS L. LAUGHLIN, IV, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/19/18.
02/02/2018
Pro Hac Vice fee as to THOMAS L. LAUGHLIN, IV, ESQ. $ 150, receipt number NEW035526 (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2018
Pro Hac Vice counsel, THOMAS LAUGHLIN, IV, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
04/25/2018
ORDER granting 4 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. DANIEL E. ONISHUK, JR. and MOHAMMED KAYYAL appointed; denying 5 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. DANIEL E. ONISHUK, JR. and MOHAMMED KAYYAL appointed. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/25/18.
18
05/16/2018
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO IVAN I. AGUILAR ONLY., re 17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by IVAN I. AGUILAR. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/16/18.
3 Attachments
3 Attachments
05/29/2018
Set Deadlines as to 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of DEBORAH CLARK-WEINTRAUB. Motion set for 6/18/2018 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Set Deadlines as to 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of RANDY L. MOONAN. Motion set for 6/18/2018 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
05/29/2018
ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Deborah Clark-Weintraub, Esq., and Randy L. Moonan, Esq, etc. 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/29/18.
06/08/2018
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ROBERT V. PRONGAY, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Pro Hac Vice fee received for Deborah Clark-Weintraub, Esq., and Randy L. Moonan, Esq,: $300, receipt number TRE092440 (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Pro Hac Vice counsel, RANDY L. MOONAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Pro Hac Vice counsel, DEBORAH CLARK-WEINTRAUB, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (Text entry; no document attached.)
1 Attachment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.