AL-NASHIRI et al v. BUSH et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Columbia

1:2008-cv-01207 (dcd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
251
12/29/2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the respondents' motion 237 to hold in abeyance, denying petitioner's motion 228 for a preliminary injunction, granting petitioner's motion 230 for leave to amend his petition for habeas, denying without prejudice motions 232 244 for leave to file an amicus brief and for proposed amici to participate in oral argument. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/29/2014.
266
12/28/2016
ORDER denying 261 Motion for Extension of Time to. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/28/2016. (lcrcl1,)
267
12/28/2016
ORDER to conduct review of classification status re: 260 Notice (Other) filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/28/2016. (lcrcl1,)
268
12/28/2016
PRESERVATION ORDER re 260 Notice (Other) filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, 265 Reply to Document filed by ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/28/2016. (lcrcl1,)
274
01/19/2017
ORDER denying 270 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 271 Motion to Stay; denying 270 Motion to Clarify; denying 272 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/19/2017. (lcrcl3,)
303
05/29/2018
Memorandum in opposition to motion
304
05/31/2018
Reply to opposition to motion
305
06/15/2018
Supplemental Memorandum
306
10/10/2018
Notice of Change of Address
307
10/11/2018
Notice of Change of Address
308
10/11/2018
Notice of Change of Address
309
11/14/2018
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.