ANDERSON v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Court Docket Sheet

Court of Federal Claims

1:2018-vv-01915 (cofc)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/14/2018
Petition
2
12/14/2018
Notice of Designation of Electronic Case (Vaccine)
3
12/14/2018
Directing Entry of Appearance
4
12/14/2018
Notice of Assignment (Special Master)
5
12/19/2018
SPU Initial Order
6
12/19/2018
Notice of Filing
7
12/19/2018
Statement of Completion
8
12/19/2018
Notice of Appearance(DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT ATTORNEY ONLY)
9
03/06/2019
Scheduling Order - Vaccine
10
05/06/2019
Status Report
05/10/2019
Scheduling Order - Vaccine - (NON PDF) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.