ANDERSON v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Pennsylvania

2:2019-cv-00262 (paed)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/18/2019
Complaint
01/18/2019
Jury Demand (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
01/31/2019
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney
3
02/07/2019
Affidavit of Service
4
02/14/2019
Affidavit of Service
5
02/14/2019
Affidavit of Service
6
02/14/2019
Affidavit of Service
7
03/01/2019
Request for Default
03/04/2019
Clerks Entry of Default (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Default Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
03/07/2019
Amend/Correct
9
03/15/2019
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
10
03/15/2019
Amended Complaint
03/15/2019
Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
03/21/2019
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney
12
03/27/2019
Stipulation and Order
13
04/02/2019
Affidavit of Service
14
04/09/2019
Affidavit of Service
15
04/09/2019
Affidavit of Service
16
04/09/2019
Affidavit of Service
17
05/01/2019
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
18
05/09/2019
Request for Default
05/09/2019
Clerks Entry of Default (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/09/2019
Default Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
05/13/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
20
05/16/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.