ANDRE M MONTANO and BETH A SWAN
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-12123 (azb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/04/2018
1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)
2
10/04/2018
Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments
10/04/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/05/2018
Request for Notice
5
10/09/2018
BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)
6
10/10/2018
Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
7
10/11/2018
zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)
8
10/20/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
9
10/20/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
10
01/14/2019
BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge
11
01/16/2019
zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)
04/17/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
Close Bankruptcy Case (MCW) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.