ANITA DARLENE JOHNSON
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Montana (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-60327 (mtb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/17/2018
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of Anita Darlene Johnson
8
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt
9
07/24/2018
Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)
10
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge
08/29/2018
Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.