ANTHONY CABRERA
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01270 (azb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Dismiss Case (Motion to)
doc
05/24/2018
Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)
doc
05/24/2018
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
doc
05/24/2018
Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order (batch)
doc
06/04/2018
Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course
1
02/12/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Anthony Cabrera
29
06/05/2018
oDismissing Case
30
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
31
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
32
07/10/2018
Final Report - Dismissed Case (Chapter 13) (batch)
08/06/2018
Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL) (DISMISSED) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.