ANTHONY CARL GRIMES and Tina Jean Grimes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Mississippi (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-02823 (mssb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/03/2017
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Anthony Carl Grimes and Tina Jean Grimes
73
01/04/2019
Dismiss Debtor - Motion/Notice for Non-Payment
74
01/07/2019
Suspend Plan Payments
77
01/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
78
02/01/2019
Suspend Plan Payments
79
02/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
81
05/09/2019
Chapter 13 Trustee Report and Account of Prior Administration of Case

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.