ANTHONY CARL SPRATLING
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Tennessee (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-04833 (tnmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
2
07/21/2018
Chapter 13 Plan
4
07/21/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments - BK Motion
5
07/21/2018
Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1
6
07/23/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling Briefing (Debtor Only)
07/23/2018
Case Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
07/23/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments - BK Order
8
07/23/2018
Extend Time of Automatic Stay Beyond 30 Days - BK Motion
9
07/23/2018
Submitted Order
07/23/2018
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
07/23/2018
SOE - Direct Pay Order
11
07/23/2018
Expedite Hearing
12
07/23/2018
Direct Pay - BK Order
14
07/25/2018
Certificate of Service
15
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
08/01/2018
Certificate of Service
20
08/10/2018
Certificate of Completion of Financial Management Course (Debtor Only)
21
08/21/2018
Submitted Order
22
08/21/2018
Extend Time of Automatic Stay Beyond 30 Days - BK Order
23
08/22/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice
24
08/23/2018
Certificate of Service
25
08/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
09/05/2018
Exhibit to 341 Meeting of Creditors Record
10/05/2018
Receipt of Filing Fee(OTC auto) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Receipt of Filing Fee(OTC auto) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/19/2018
Certificate of Completion of Financial Management Course (Debtor Only)
33
11/01/2018
Notice of Claim Filed by Debtor
34
11/01/2018
Notice of Claim Filed by Debtor
35
11/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
36
11/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
37
02/06/2019
SOE - Direct Pay Order
38
02/07/2019
Direct Pay - BK Order
39
02/07/2019
Notice of Intent to Pay Claims
40
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.