ANTHONY DUY NGUYEN
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Minnesota (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-31718 (mnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors
1
05/31/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Anthony duy Nguyen
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan
13
08/27/2018
MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification
14
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
17
09/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
18
10/01/2018
MNB Order granting compensation - Ch 13 (Post and Pre)
19
10/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.