ANTHONY PATRICK RICHARDSON
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Tennessee (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00385 (tnmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/23/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
2
01/23/2019
Chapter 13 Plan
4
01/23/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments - BK Motion
5
01/23/2019
Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1
6
01/23/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling Briefing (Debtor Only)
7
01/23/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
01/23/2019
Case Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
01/23/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments - BK Order
01/24/2019
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/24/2019
SOE - Direct Pay Order
10
01/24/2019
Direct Pay - BK Order
12
01/25/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice
13
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
01/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
01/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
01/29/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice
17
01/29/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (Pre Confirmation)
18
01/29/2019
Certificate of Service
19
01/30/2019
SOE - Direct Pay Order
20
01/30/2019
Direct Pay - BK Order
21
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
03/06/2019
Continued 341 Meeting of Creditors/Confirmation Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
03/18/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
24
04/09/2019
Notice of Claim Filed by Debtor
25
04/09/2019
SOE - Direct Pay Order
26
04/10/2019
Direct Pay - BK Order
27
04/10/2019
Dismiss for Failure to Confirm Plan - BK Motion
28
04/10/2019
Objection to Confirmation of Plan and Trustee's Request for Hearing - BK Motion
29
04/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
04/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
31
04/16/2019
Exhibit to 341 Meeting of Creditors Record
32
04/19/2019
Certificate of Completion of Financial Management Course (Debtor Only)
33
04/23/2019
Notice of Change of Address (Debtor Only)
34
05/06/2019
SOE - Confirmation of Plan
35
05/07/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan - BK Order (SA)
36
05/07/2019
Submitted Order
37
05/09/2019
Dismiss for Failure to Confirm Plan - BK Order
38
05/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
39
05/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.