ARENAS v. USA
Court Docket Sheet

Court of Federal Claims

1:2017-cv-01496 (cofc)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
12
05/18/2018
Extension of Time
13
05/21/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
14
07/19/2018
Extension of Time
15
07/23/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
16
09/04/2018
Extension of Time
17
09/05/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
18
10/19/2018
Extension of Time
19
10/22/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
20
11/20/2018
Stipulation
11/20/2018
Terminate Civil Case - Stip (ECF ONLY) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.