ARIAN v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Court Docket Sheet

Court of Federal Claims

1:2018-vv-00992 (cofc)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/11/2018
Petition
2
07/11/2018
Notice of Designation of Electronic Case (Vaccine)
3
07/11/2018
Directing Entry of Appearance
4
07/12/2018
Notice of Assignment (Special Master)
5
07/12/2018
Initial Order
6
07/12/2018
Medical Records
9
10/23/2018
Extension of Time
10/23/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/19/2018
Extension of Time
12/19/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
01/09/2019
Medical Records
12
02/19/2019
Extension of Time
13
02/19/2019
Scheduling Order - Vaccine
14
03/08/2019
Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement (240 Day Notice)
15
03/27/2019
Notice of Appearance(DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT ATTORNEY ONLY)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.