ARMANDO SANTOS CRUZ
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Puerto Rico (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-01923 (prb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/25/2018
Schedule G
1
04/10/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Armando Santos Cruz
doc
05/25/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs
29
06/08/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (v3.1)
38
07/19/2018
Minutes Of 341 Meeting Continued
56
01/08/2019
Order Discharging Trustee And Closing Estate (Chap. 13)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.