ART VAN FURNITURE, LLC v. ZIMMER et al
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Michigan

2:2019-cv-10880 (mied)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/25/2019
Civil Case - Complaint
3
03/25/2019
Motion - Free
03/26/2019
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
03/26/2019
Appearance
12
04/10/2019
Response to Motion
13
04/12/2019
Response to Motion
14
04/14/2019
Hearing on Motion*
15
04/15/2019
Appearance
16
04/17/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
17
04/17/2019
Dismiss
18
04/18/2019
Order
19
04/19/2019
Motion - Free
20
05/08/2019
Response to Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.