ARTURO ALVAREZ SOLIS
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-13985 (azb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/14/2018
1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition
3
11/15/2018
Notice to Pro Se Debtors Form
11/14/2018
Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
1Statement of Social Security Number (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/15/2018
Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)
6
11/15/2018
Initial Mailing List
7
11/15/2018
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney
8
11/15/2018
AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)
9
11/15/2018
Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)
10
11/15/2018
Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments
11
11/15/2018
Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee
12
11/15/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Preparer
13
11/15/2018
Request for Notice
14
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
11/19/2018
BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)
16
11/21/2018
zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)
18
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
01/03/2019
oDismissing Case - VAN Form
20
01/05/2019
zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)
01/11/2019
Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/14/2019
Reinstate Case (Motion to)
22
01/14/2019
oReinstating Case - VAN Form
23
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/17/2019
Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
02/15/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
03/08/2019
Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
03/13/2019
BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge
26
03/15/2019
zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.