ASI CONSTRUCTORS, INC. v. USA
Court Docket Sheet

Court of Federal Claims

1:2016-cv-00687 (cofc)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
21
05/31/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
22
06/01/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
23
09/05/2018
Protective Order
24
09/13/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
25
09/14/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
26
09/27/2018
Notice (Other) PLEASE DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL
27
01/02/2019
Stipulation of Dismissal
01/03/2019
Terminate Civil Case - Stip (ECF ONLY) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.