AVILA-MIRANDA V. REYNOLDS, ET AL.
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of North Carolina

1:2018-cv-00120 (ncmd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
13
05/18/2018
Amend
14
05/18/2018
Amend
15
05/18/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
16
06/01/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
17
06/08/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
07/06/2018
Motions Submitted (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
12/20/2018
Notice of Appearance
19
03/12/2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, as to NESTOR DANIEL AVILA-MIRANDA, signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 3/12/2019. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, (Doc. 13), is G RANTED. Within 7 days of the entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order, Plaintiff shall file and serve the Second Amended Complaint in the form attached to his motion. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Gregory Jackson's Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. 9), is hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as MOOT.
20
03/12/2019
Amended Complaint
21
03/26/2019
Answer to Amended Complaint
22
03/26/2019
Answer to Amended Complaint
23
04/03/2019
Notice of Appearance
24
04/03/2019
Answer to Amended Complaint
25
04/03/2019
Corporate Disclosure Statement
26
04/05/2019
Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing
27
04/05/2019
Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.