AVILES WALKER v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Court Docket Sheet

District of New Jersey

1:2018-cv-08213 (njd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
05/23/2018
Letter: re USM 285
6
06/20/2018
Certificate of Clerk
7
06/20/2018
Summons Issued
8
08/01/2018
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
11
09/12/2018
Order
09/12/2018
Terminate Civil Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
10/26/2018
Stipulation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.