Aaron Lamar Hayden
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02063 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 183 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/17/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Aaron Lamar Hayden
2
05/17/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Aaron Lamar Hayden.
3
05/17/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Aaron Lamar Hayden
5
05/17/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Aaron Lamar Hayden.
6
05/17/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Aaron Lamar Hayden.
7
05/17/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Aaron Lamar Hayden.
8
05/17/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Aaron Lamar Hayden.
9
05/17/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/20/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/31/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 07/26/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/13/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 08/20/2018.
10
05/18/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
05/18/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Aaron Lamar Hayden Case Number 16-00458, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/09/2016, Standard Discharge on 05/09/2016.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
05/18/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Aaron Lamar Hayden).
12
05/18/2018
Notes: No Discharge flag set pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1328(f). Debtor received a discharge in case #16-00458-TOM-7 on May 9, 2016
13
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 05/19/2018.
14
05/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/20/2018.
15
05/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Aaron Lamar Hayden). Notice Date 05/20/2018.
16
05/21/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
17
06/19/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Aaron Lamar Hayden.
18
06/19/2018
Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q) for Debtor Filed by Debtor Aaron Lamar Hayden.
19
06/20/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 06/20/2018. (Ch13troffice, sd)
07/12/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 135.70 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, cs) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-02063-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (135.70) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22275168. Fee Amount 135.70 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.