Aaron Paul Wiggins and Stephanie Ann Wiggins
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Louisiana (Bankruptcy)

4:2015-bk-51157 (lawb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
39
10/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
42
12/17/2018
Amended or Supplement to Schedules I, J,J-2
43
12/22/2018
Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Fee)
12/22/2018
Autodocket US Treasury Receipt (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
12/26/2018
Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim
45
12/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.