Aaron Wade Buster
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00049 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/15/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
02/15/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
02/15/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/15/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
02/17/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
02/19/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
02/21/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
8
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
02/22/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
12
02/26/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
13
02/26/2019
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
14
02/26/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
15
03/01/2019
Request for Special Notice
16
03/18/2019
Request for Special Notice
03/21/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
04/22/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
18
04/24/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
19
04/24/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
20
04/24/2019
Certificate of Service
04/24/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
05/01/2019
Dismissing Case (SA)
05/01/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
05/02/2019
Proceeding Memo
05/02/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
05/03/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
24
05/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
05/14/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
05/15/2019
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
26
05/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
05/21/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.