Aaron Wayne Burkhart
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00046 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/26/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Aaron Wayne Burkhart
29
07/11/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
30
08/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
31
08/17/2018
Claims (SA)
08/17/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
33
08/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
34
05/02/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
35
05/02/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
36
05/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
37
05/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.