Abbie McGonigle
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of New Hampshire (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-10557 (nhb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
8
07/09/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
9
07/24/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) Ch7
07/25/2018
Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
07/25/2018
Close Case
11
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
12
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (BK)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.