Abbott Cardiovascular Systems, Inc. et al v. Edwards Lifesciences Corp. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Delaware

1:2019-cv-00149 (ded)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/28/2019
Complaint
2
01/28/2019
Magistrate Consent Forms
3
01/28/2019
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
4
01/28/2019
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
01/28/2019
Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/28/2019
Leave to File Document
6
01/28/2019
Declaration
7
01/28/2019
Return of Service Executed
8
01/28/2019
Return of Service Executed
01/29/2019
Remark (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/29/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File
10
01/29/2019
Preliminary Injunction
11
01/29/2019
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
12
01/29/2019
Declaration
13
01/29/2019
Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials
14
01/29/2019
Redacted Document
15
01/29/2019
Redacted Document
16
01/30/2019
Appear Pro Hac Vice
01/30/2019
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
SO ORDERED (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
01/31/2019
Affidavit
18
01/31/2019
Affidavit
02/05/2019
Add Attorneys - PHV only (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Add Attorneys - PHV only (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/06/2019
Letter
02/07/2019
Order Setting Teleconference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
Telephone Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
02/11/2019
Notice of Service
21
02/11/2019
- Transcript
22
02/11/2019
Appear Pro Hac Vice
02/11/2019
SO ORDERED (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
02/11/2019
Notice of Appearance
02/12/2019
Add Attorneys - PHV only (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
02/13/2019
Declaration
25
02/13/2019
Letter
02/14/2019
- CORRECTING ENTRY (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
Oral Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
Add Attorneys - PHV only (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/15/2019
Add Attorneys - PHV only (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
02/15/2019
Notice of Service
28
02/15/2019
Notice of Service
29
02/18/2019
Notice of Appearance
30
02/18/2019
Temporary Restraining Order
31
02/18/2019
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
32
02/18/2019
Declaration
33
02/18/2019
Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
34
02/18/2019
Redacted Document
02/19/2019
SO ORDERED (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
02/18/2019
Redacted Document
36
02/19/2019
Notice of Service
37
02/19/2019
Answer to Complaint
38
02/20/2019
Letter
39
02/20/2019
Request for Oral Argument
40
02/20/2019
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
41
02/21/2019
Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition
42
02/21/2019
Declaration
43
02/21/2019
Declaration
44
02/21/2019
Declaration
45
02/21/2019
Declaration
46
02/21/2019
Declaration
47
02/21/2019
Declaration
48
02/21/2019
Declaration
49
02/21/2019
Declaration
50
02/22/2019
Appear Pro Hac Vice
02/22/2019
SO ORDERED (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
Add Attorneys - PHV only (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
02/25/2019
Brief - Reply
52
02/25/2019
Declaration
53
02/25/2019
Redacted Document
54
02/26/2019
Redacted Document
55
02/26/2019
Redacted Document
56
02/27/2019
Notice of Service
57
02/28/2019
Notice of Service
58
02/28/2019
Redacted Document
59
02/28/2019
Redacted Document
60
02/28/2019
Redacted Document
61
02/28/2019
Redacted Document
62
03/03/2019
Letter
63
03/05/2019
Order on Motion for TRO
64
03/08/2019
Complaint - Amended
65
03/12/2019
Proposed Order
66
03/13/2019
Order
03/13/2019
Order Setting Teleconference (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
03/18/2019
Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
03/18/2019
SO ORDERED (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
03/18/2019
Notice - Other
70
03/18/2019
Letter
71
03/19/2019
Notice of Service
72
03/19/2019
Notice of Service
73
03/20/2019
Letter
74
03/21/2019
Order
03/21/2019
Oral Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Order Setting Teleconference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
Telephone Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
03/21/2019
Letter
77
03/21/2019
Letter
79
03/22/2019
Proposed Order
80
03/22/2019
Protective Order
81
03/22/2019
Answer to Amended Complaint
82
03/25/2019
Redacted Document
83
03/25/2019
Redacted Document
84
03/25/2019
Redacted Document
03/26/2019
- CORRECTING ENTRY (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
03/29/2019
Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition
04/01/2019
Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
03/29/2019
Declaration
87
03/29/2019
Exhibit to a Document
88
03/29/2019
Exhibit to a Document
89
03/29/2019
Exhibit to a Document
90
03/29/2019
Exhibit to a Document
91
03/29/2019
Declaration
92
03/29/2019
Declaration
93
03/29/2019
Declaration
94
03/29/2019
Declaration
95
03/29/2019
Declaration
96
03/29/2019
Declaration
97
04/01/2019
Redacted Document
04/02/2019
Oral Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
99
04/02/2019
Notice of Service
100
04/04/2019
Appear Pro Hac Vice
04/04/2019
SO ORDERED (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
Add Attorneys - PHV only (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
04/05/2019
Redacted Document
04/09/2019
Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
102
04/05/2019
Redacted Document
103
04/05/2019
Redacted Document
104
04/05/2019
Redacted Document
105
04/05/2019
Redacted Document
106
04/05/2019
Redacted Document
107
04/05/2019
Redacted Document
108
04/05/2019
Redacted Document
109
04/05/2019
Redacted Document
110
04/09/2019
Brief - Reply
111
04/09/2019
Declaration
112
04/09/2019
Exhibit to a Document
113
04/09/2019
Exhibit to a Document
114
04/09/2019
Exhibit to a Document
115
04/09/2019
Exhibit to a Document
116
04/09/2019
Exhibit to a Document
117
04/09/2019
Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials
04/11/2019
Oral Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
119
04/11/2019
Proposed Order
120
04/11/2019
Declaration
121
04/12/2019
Answer to Counterclaim
04/12/2019
Oral Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
123
04/15/2019
Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials
04/15/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
124
04/16/2019
Redacted Document
125
04/16/2019
Redacted Document
126
04/16/2019
Redacted Document
127
04/16/2019
Redacted Document
128
04/16/2019
Redacted Document
129
04/16/2019
Redacted Document
130
04/16/2019
Redacted Document
131
04/16/2019
Redacted Document
132
04/17/2019
Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials
04/18/2019
Oral Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
134
04/22/2019
Letter
135
04/22/2019
Letter
136
04/22/2019
--Transcript (SEALED)
04/22/2019
Oral Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
138
04/22/2019
Letter
139
04/24/2019
Redacted Document
140
04/25/2019
--Transcript - Redacted
141
04/26/2019
Letter
142
04/26/2019
Letter
143
04/29/2019
Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel
144
05/01/2019
Letter
145
05/01/2019
Letter
146
05/01/2019
Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials
147
05/03/2019
Redacted Document
148
05/03/2019
Letter
149
05/05/2019
Letter
150
05/08/2019
- Transcript
151
05/08/2019
Letter
152
05/08/2019
Redacted Document
153
05/08/2019
Redacted Document
154
05/10/2019
Redacted Document
05/13/2019
Oral Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
156
05/13/2019
Redacted Document
157
05/13/2019
Redacted Document
158
05/14/2019
Letter
159
05/14/2019
Redacted Document
160
05/20/2019
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
05/21/2019
SO ORDERED (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.