Abbott et al v. Ciampolillo et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida

6:2017-cv-02087 (flmd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
20
07/11/2018
Notice of mediation conference/hearing
21
07/16/2018
Notice of mediation conference/hearing
22
08/29/2018
Mediation report
08/30/2018
Order to comply with Local Rule (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
08/31/2018
Notice of settlement
25
09/04/2018
Order
09/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
09/26/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal
28
09/27/2018
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.