Abigael Ruth Mirbel
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Massachusetts (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-12111 (mab)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/05/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Abigael Ruth Mirbel
15
06/12/2018
Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)
42
09/24/2018
Certificate of Conference
69
12/06/2018
Order on Objection to Claim
72
02/11/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
73
02/11/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
74
02/15/2019
Adequate Protection
75
02/20/2019
Opposition
76
02/22/2019
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
79
02/25/2019
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing
82
03/11/2019
Continue/Cancel Hearing
83
03/12/2019
Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing
84
03/13/2019
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing
85
04/17/2019
Continue/Cancel Hearing
86
04/17/2019
Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing
87
04/19/2019
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing
88
04/30/2019
Stipulation
89
04/30/2019
Approve
90
05/01/2019
Order on Motion for Approval
92
05/20/2019
Order on Motion for Approval

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.