Achterberg, Jr. et al v. Creditors Trade Association, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of California (Bankruptcy)

9:2015-ap-09054 (caeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/18/2018
Compel (Order)
109
11/16/2018
Generic Motion/Application - Including Amended Motion
110
11/16/2018
Notice of Hearing
111
11/16/2018
Declaration
112
11/16/2018
Memorandum of Points and Authorities
113
11/16/2018
Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments
123
12/21/2018
BNC Service of Document
124
12/23/2018
BNC Service of Document (Certificate)
125
12/23/2018
BNC Service of Order (Certificate)
126
12/26/2018
Matter Held *
129
01/11/2019
Matter Held *
130
02/05/2019
Stipulation
133
02/10/2019
BNC Service of Document (Certificate)
134
02/10/2019
BNC Service of Order (Certificate)
135
02/14/2019
Settlement Agreement/Notice of Settlement Agreement
136
02/19/2019
Matter Continued *
137
02/27/2019
Generic Order
02/27/2019
Terminate Motion (No Relief Ordered) (Text entry; no document attached.)
142
03/03/2019
BNC Service of Document (Certificate)
143
03/03/2019
BNC Service of Document (Certificate)
144
03/15/2019
Matter Held *

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.