Achterhof et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of West Virginia

2:2015-cv-09461 (wvsd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
12
06/18/2018
Pretrial Order
13
07/20/2018
MDL Order Moving Case To Inactive Docket
14
08/24/2018
Order
15
10/03/2018
Dismiss
16
10/24/2018
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.