Achyut M Tope
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Connecticut (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-32033 (ctb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/13/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
2
12/13/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
12/13/2018
Meeting of Creditors 13 - New Haven (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
none (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
12/14/2018
Request for Notices
5
12/14/2018
Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal
6
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
7
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
12/17/2018
Meeting of Creditors Continued (in advance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
12/19/2018
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
9
12/19/2018
Request for Notices
10
12/19/2018
Request for Notices
11
12/21/2018
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
12
01/21/2019
Extend Time
13
01/23/2019
Notice of Hearing Set
14
01/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
15
01/28/2019
Request for Notices
02/06/2019
Hearing Held (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
Extend Time (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
02/06/2019
Generate BNC Notice/Form
18
02/06/2019
Digital Audio Recording
02/08/2019
Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
20
02/11/2019
Dismissing Case
21
02/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case
22
02/26/2019
Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)
02/27/2019
Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.