Acosta v. State of Alaska, Department of Transportation and Public Facilities
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cv-00009 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
18
07/06/2018
Notice (Other)
19
07/31/2018
Partial Summary Judgment
20
08/20/2018
Notice (Other)
21
08/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
22
08/20/2018
Declaration
23
08/21/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
24
09/19/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
25
09/19/2018
Affidavit
26
10/03/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
27
10/09/2018
Stay
28
10/09/2018
Expedite
29
10/09/2018
Affidavit
30
10/10/2018
Order on Motion to Expedite
31
10/16/2018
Notice (Other)
32
11/06/2018
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 11/6/18.
33
01/15/2019
Order
34
01/16/2019
Order
35
01/30/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
36
01/31/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
37
02/19/2019
Stay
38
02/21/2019
Order on Motion to Stay

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.